TN SB1016 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the comptroller of the treasury to study the economic impact to the state and local governments as the result of the passage and approval of chapter 973 of the Public Acts of 2018 regarding sanctuary policies, and to report to the senate state and local committee and the state government committee and local government committee of the house of representatives by January 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, directs the comptroller of the treasury to study the economic impact to the state and local governments as the result of the passage and approval of chapter 973 of the Public Acts of 2018 regarding sanctuary policies, and to report to the senate state and local committee and the state government committee and local government committee of the house of representatives by January 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1016&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SB1016.pdf |