TN SB0993 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that the fiscal review committee must be allowed to review noncompetitive procurement agreements; requires the chief procurement officer to report procurement contracts monthly to the fiscal review committee; revises provisions governing public employees accepting employment with respondent to a solicitation or contractor in certain situations; revises other provisions related to state contracts. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 49, relative to acquisition of goods and services by the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1046 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 05/26/2021