TN SB0993 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that in any action for retroactive child support filed on or after July 1, 2017, retroactive child support may not be awarded for a period more than five years from date the action for support is filed unless the court determines, for good cause shown, that a different award of retroactive child support is in the interest of justice; creates exceptions and enacts related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As enacted, specifies that in any action for retroactive child support filed on or after July 1, 2017, retroactive child support may not be awarded for a period more than five years from date the action for support is filed unless the court determines, for good cause shown, that a different award of retroactive child support is in the interest of justice; creates exceptions and enacts related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/ amendement(s), refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/ amendement(s), refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 419 | |
2017-05-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2017-05-05 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0523) |
2017-05-05 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 21, Nays 3, PNV 3 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0469) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 2 PNV 2 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1126 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 419