TN SB0993 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the secretary of state's signature on certain certificates may be in facsimile "or other electronic format;" authorizes common carriers who deliver, and terminal operators who remove, petroleum products, to notify the department by electronic transmission other than facsimile. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the secretary of state's signature on certain certificates may be in facsimile "or other electronic format;" authorizes common carriers who deliver, and terminal operators who remove, petroleum products, to notify the department by electronic transmission other than facsimile. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. on 4/1/14 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0090 (Crossfiled) 2013-01-30 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0993&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0993.pdf |