TN SB0988 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes wineries, farm wineries, and manufacturers of alcoholic beverages to distill and fortify wine and blend the distilled or fortified wine with their products. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 3, relative to wine.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Effective date(s) 04/04/2023 | |
2023-04-18 | Pub. Ch. 131 | |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-03-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 84, Nays 7, PNV 4 |
2023-03-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0099) |
2023-03-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0098) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0384 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 131