TN SB0984 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the Third Coast Comedy Club in Nashville as a community theater for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As introduced, designates the Third Coast Comedy Club in Nashville as a community theater for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4, PNV 3 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0094) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1436 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Def. to Summer Study in State Committee