TN SB0969 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 589
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 589
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes issuance of various special license plates; extends minimum order deadline for certain plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes issuance of various special license plates; extends minimum order deadline for certain plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 589 | |
2009-06-16 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0667) | |
2009-06-16 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0720) | |
2009-06-16 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-06-12 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009 | |
2009-06-01 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 06/01/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1335 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-16 - Pub. Ch. 589