TN SB0959 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, includes conscious disregard of the rights or interest of the employer's business to the actions of the employee that may constitute "misconduct" and disqualify the employee from eligibility to receive unemployment benefits. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, includes conscious disregard of the rights or interest of the employer's business to the actions of the employee that may constitute "misconduct" and disqualify the employee from eligibility to receive unemployment benefits. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0792 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn.