TN SB0957 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "surveillance camera" as used in the rules of the road. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 7; Title 54 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, defines "surveillance camera" as used in the rules of the road. - Amends TCA Title 6; Title 7; Title 54 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 5/4/2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/27/2010 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1324 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0957&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0957.pdf |