TN SB0951 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds various exceptions to mandatory retention for third grade students who are not proficient in English language arts; allows an LEA to retain students in any of the grades kindergarten through two who have not shown a basic understanding of the curriculum and an ability to perform the skills required in reading; requires the department of education to provide LEAs with individual student performance level ratings from the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program tests by May 19 each year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0848 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration