TN SB0946 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a Class C felony of reckless endangerment; authorizes courts to revoke or prohibit the issuance of a driver license to individuals convicted of such offenses. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to reckless endangerment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022
2022-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022
2021-04-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2022
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1321 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback