TN SB0946 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the deadline for the Tennessee bureau of investigation to report to the judiciary committee of the senate and the civil justice committee of the house of representatives regarding costs associated with conducting background checks from February 1 to March 1. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, extends the deadline for the Tennessee bureau of investigation to report to the judiciary committee of the senate and the civil justice committee of the house of representatives regarding costs associated with conducting background checks from February 1 to March 1. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0438 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0946&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0946.pdf |