TN SB0934 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 180 days to 90 days, the amount of time in which an operator of a crematory facility must wait from the date of cremation before interring, entombing, or inurning unclaimed cremated human remains. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 5, relative to the funeral industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0939 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.