TN SB0932 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits local authorities to regulate the use of tobacco products in public places, places of employment, and parks. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1551.
Title
As introduced, permits local authorities to regulate the use of tobacco products in public places, places of employment, and parks. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1551.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Sen. Rosalind Kurita [I] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendments, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendments, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 1 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0040) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0241) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1335 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Def. to Summer Study in Local Committee