TN SB0932 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds certain synthetic cannabinoids to the list for which it is an offense to knowingly produce, manufacture, distribute, possess, or possess with intent to produce, manufacture, or distribute. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-438.
Title
As enacted, adds certain synthetic cannabinoids to the list for which it is an offense to knowingly produce, manufacture, distribute, possess, or possess with intent to produce, manufacture, or distribute. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-438.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Pub. Ch. 401 | |
2015-05-20 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0168) |
2015-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0322) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1173 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 401