TN HB1173 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds certain synthetic cannabinoids to the list for which it is an offense to knowingly produce, manufacture, distribute, possess, or possess with intent to produce, manufacture, or distribute. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-438.
Title
As enacted, adds certain synthetic cannabinoids to the list for which it is an offense to knowingly produce, manufacture, distribute, possess, or possess with intent to produce, manufacture, or distribute. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-438.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 401 | |
2015-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0932 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 401
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1173&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1173.pdf |