TN SB0925 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts an out-of-state provider of home medical equipment services from the requirement to maintain an office or place of business within this state if the provider provides home medical equipment that is not available from a provider that has an office or place of business within this state. - Amends TCA Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, relative to medical equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-03-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-13HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 2, PNV 1
2023-03-13HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0070)
2023-03-13HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2023-03-09HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2023-03-07SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-06SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-03-06SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2023-03-06SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0079)
2023-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/6/2023
2023-03-01SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2023-02-22SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/1/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1429 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback