TN SB0924 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises certain provisions concerning payment of claims to non-governmental, nonprofit healthcare research institutions. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23.
Title
As introduced, revises certain provisions concerning payment of claims to non-governmental, nonprofit healthcare research institutions. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of C,L&A Com. | |
2011-03-08 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/8/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/1/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1160 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-10 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0924&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0924.pdf |