TN SB0918 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows the East Tennessee regional agribusiness marketing authority to develop, market, and promote facilities for warehousing, distribution, light manufacturing, and agribusiness purposes, and enter lease purchase agreements by a two-thirds (2/3) majority vote by the board, and removes tax exempt status for any ETRAMA property sold under a lease purchase agreement. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 10, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, allows the East Tennessee regional agribusiness marketing authority to develop, market, and promote facilities for warehousing, distribution, light manufacturing, and agribusiness purposes, and enter lease purchase agreements by a two-thirds (2/3) majority vote by the board, and removes tax exempt status for any ETRAMA property sold under a lease purchase agreement. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 10, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Pub. Ch. 180
2019-05-01 Effective date(s) 04/23/2019
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-11SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-10SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-10HousePassed H., Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 3
2019-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-07HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019
2019-02-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/20/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0503 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 180

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback