TN SB0899 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1029
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1029
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, amends the provisions governing X-ray equipment operators. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, amends the provisions governing X-ray equipment operators. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 1029 | |
2016-05-05 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2016; 01/01/2017 | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0999) |
2016-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0810) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0993 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1029