TN SB0882 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a court, in setting bail for a defendant charged with driving under the influence of an intoxicant or another offense in which alcohol was involved, to require the person to operate only a motor vehicle equipped with a functioning ignition interlock device unless such an order would not be in the best interest of justice. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 11, relative to conditions of bond.
Sponsors
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-06 | Pub. Ch. 1134 | |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1011) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0912) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1188 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1134