TN SB0867 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of present law relative to credits to dealers, credits to prevent multistate taxations, and credits for the resale of telecommunication services of sales and use taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-24 | Pub. Ch. 467 | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0447) |
2023-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0459) |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0654 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467