TN SB0849 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits county legislative bodies by a two-thirds vote to authorize the sheriff to establish a county militia. - Amends TCA Title 58.
Title
As introduced, permits county legislative bodies by a two-thirds vote to authorize the sheriff to establish a county militia. - Amends TCA Title 58.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0902 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0849&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0849.pdf |