TN SB0840 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 144
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the amendment to TCA Section 71-4-502(4) made by Chapter 976 of the Public Acts of 2012 as the "Scott Young Blind Vendors Act." - Amends TCA Section 71-4-502 and Chapter 976 of the Public Acts of 2012.
Title
As enacted, designates the amendment to TCA Section 71-4-502(4) made by Chapter 976 of the Public Acts of 2012 as the "Scott Young Blind Vendors Act." - Amends TCA Section 71-4-502 and Chapter 976 of the Public Acts of 2012.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - S. H&W COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Pub. Ch. 144 |
2013-04-24 | House | Effective date(s) 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-02 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-19 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/25/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/20/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0322 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 144