TN SB0835 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of Tennessee Fraternal Order of Police new specialty earmarked license plates to members and associate members of organization without 1,000 plate minimum and allocates 50% of revenues derived from sale thereof to organization's charitable foundation; deletes authorization for National Fraternal Order of Police new specialty earmarked license plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of Tennessee Fraternal Order of Police new specialty earmarked license plates to members and associate members of organization without 1,000 plate minimum and allocates 50% of revenues derived from sale thereof to organization's charitable foundation; deletes authorization for National Fraternal Order of Police new specialty earmarked license plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Tracy (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Tracy (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-04-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-04-04 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-04-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0183) | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1037 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-15 - Action Def. in Transportation Committee to Omnibus Special License Plate Bill