TN SB0832 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits as against public policy a metropolitan government ordinance, charter provision, or resolution that requires a supermajority vote of the local legislative body in order to make improvements to, renovations to, or the demolition and replacement of existing facilities owned by the metropolitan government when such facilities are to be used for substantially the same purpose as the use prior to any changes; requires that the voting requirement for such actions involving existing facilities must be the same voting requirement applicable to ordinances of the legislative body in general. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6 and Title 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 5; Title 6 and Title 7, relative to local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 364 | |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/3/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0864 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/05/2023