TN SB0830 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 850
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 850
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various present law provisions governing public charter schools, including the approval process. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, revises various present law provisions governing public charter schools, including the approval process. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 850 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA0530) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0525) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0524) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0108) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/19/2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 3 PNV 1 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/neutral recommend. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. Gov. Ops Comm. 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ref. to S. Gov. Ops Comm. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Recalled from S. F,W&M Comm. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Recalled from S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0702 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 850