TN SB0828 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that disposition of remains from a surgical abortion performed at an abortion facility be by burial or cremation; requires the department of health to promulgate certain rules and forms; and makes certain other changes regarding the disposition of fetal remains. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 10; Title 39; Title 62, Chapter 5 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 10; Title 39; Title 62, Chapter 5 and Title 68, relative to abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-19SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/21/2021
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
2021-04-07SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1181 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-06 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback