TN HB1181 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that disposition of remains from a surgical abortion performed at an abortion facility be by burial or cremation; requires the department of health to promulgate certain rules and forms; and makes certain other changes regarding the disposition of fetal remains. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 10; Title 39; Title 62, Chapter 5 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 10; Title 39; Title 62, Chapter 5 and Title 68, relative to abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06 Signed by Governor.
2021-04-27HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-04-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-21SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 6
2021-04-21SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0259)
2021-04-21SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-21SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-20HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 22, PNV 0
2021-04-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0283)
2021-04-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0280)
2021-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
2021-04-12HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2021
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-30HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-16HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0828 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback