TN SB0823 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Rural Renewal Award Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 9 and Title 49, relative to enhancing the high-need workforce in rural and underserved counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1101 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration