TN SB0823 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, subjects conveyances to forfeiture if used in the transport, concealment or storage of money or goods that were the subject of a burglary, aggravated burglary or especially aggravated burglary. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 7 and Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, subjects conveyances to forfeiture if used in the transport, concealment or storage of money or goods that were the subject of a burglary, aggravated burglary or especially aggravated burglary. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 7 and Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 285 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | S. Reset on cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0093 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 285