TN SB0817 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Horse Racing Control Act of 2019," authorizing and regulating parimutuel wagering on horse racing. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 39; Title 44 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Horse Racing Control Act of 2019," authorizing and regulating parimutuel wagering on horse racing. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 39; Title 44 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1421 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee