TN SB0817 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that in civil actions in which the plaintiff makes a demand for monetary damages, the extent, amount and other relevant information concerning any liability insurance coverage the defendant has is discoverable under rules of civil procedure regardless of whether the information may or may not lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 23; Title 24; Title 25; Title 26; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 30; Title 31; Title 32; Title 35 and Title 36.
Title
As introduced, specifies that in civil actions in which the plaintiff makes a demand for monetary damages, the extent, amount and other relevant information concerning any liability insurance coverage the defendant has is discoverable under rules of civil procedure regardless of whether the information may or may not lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 23; Title 24; Title 25; Title 26; Title 27; Title 28; Title 29; Title 30; Title 31; Title 32; Title 35 and Title 36.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1149 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-19 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0817&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0817.pdf |