TN SB0807 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts from licensure requirements person providing direct care services to no more than three people receiving services through consumer direction in a medicaid home- and community-based services program. - Amends TCA Section 33-2-402 and Section 33-2-403.
Title
As enacted, exempts from licensure requirements person providing direct care services to no more than three people receiving services through consumer direction in a medicaid home- and community-based services program. - Amends TCA Section 33-2-402 and Section 33-2-403.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 89 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 04/04/2019 | |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0036) |
2019-03-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0038) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0951 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 89