TN SB0806 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies duties of health departments that provide certain dental services "to the extent possible within budget limitations". - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, clarifies duties of health departments that provide certain dental services "to the extent possible within budget limitations". - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766 | |
2010-04-01 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1066) | |
2010-04-01 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-03-30 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/01/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2009-05-13 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1871 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 766
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0806&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0806.pdf |