TN SB0805 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the Governor's Investment in Vocational Education Act; specifies that financial assistance received for all dual enrollment courses attempted after the fourth dual enrollment course reduces any subsequent award of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-930.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the Governor's Investment in Vocational Education Act; specifies that financial assistance received for all dual enrollment courses attempted after the fourth dual enrollment course reduces any subsequent award of the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-930.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-11SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-10SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-10HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-10HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0111)
2019-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-03-28SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0083)
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0949 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback