TN SB0804 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a registration program for the regulation and oversight of bail bondsmen by the department of commerce and insurance. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 8; Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 8; Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 11, relative to bail bonding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0897 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee