TN SB0801 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 3 percent to 2 percent the assessment rate for a licensed nursing home that on July 1, 2020, operated as part of a continuing care retirement community. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1061 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee