TN SB0800 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes the Governor's Civics Seal to recognize public schools and local education agencies implementing high-quality civic education programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes the Governor's Civics Seal to recognize public schools and local education agencies implementing high-quality civic education programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0944 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Placed on cal. Education for 3/20/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback