TN HB0944 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes the Governor's Civics Seal to recognize public schools and local education agencies implementing high-quality civic education programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes the Governor's Civics Seal to recognize public schools and local education agencies implementing high-quality civic education programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0800 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-19 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback