TN SB0800 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the commissioner of economic and community development, in consultation with MTAS and CTAS, to study the effects of state and local tax incentives on the economic development of municipalities and counties. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, directs the commissioner of economic and community development, in consultation with MTAS and CTAS, to study the effects of state and local tax incentives on the economic development of municipalities and counties. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-03-22 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-22 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. S&L Gov. 3/27/12 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0851 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-20 - Sponsor change.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0800&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0800.pdf |