TN SB0788 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires each LEA to have an open enrollment period in which a parent or guardian of a student may seek to transfer the parent's or guardian's student to a school in the LEA that the student is not zoned to attend. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to open enrollment.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2021 | |
2021-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 479 | |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 24, Nays 2, PNV 2 (Amendment 1 - HA0408) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 5, PNV 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0408) |
2021-04-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 3 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1305 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 479