TN SB0772 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner, in collaboration with the commissioner of correction, to study the use of a shared data system to monitor individuals from their release from a correctional facility to employment and report their findings jointly to the state and local government committee of the senate and the state government committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires commissioner, in collaboration with the commissioner of correction, to study the use of a shared data system to monitor individuals from their release from a correctional facility to employment and report their findings jointly to the state and local government committee of the senate and the state government committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1034 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Def. to Study Calendar