TN HB1034 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Def. to Study Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Def. to Study Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner, in collaboration with the commissioner of correction, to study the use of a shared data system to monitor individuals from their release from a correctional facility to employment and report their findings jointly to the state and local government committee of the senate and the state government committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires commissioner, in collaboration with the commissioner of correction, to study the use of a shared data system to monitor individuals from their release from a correctional facility to employment and report their findings jointly to the state and local government committee of the senate and the state government committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Def. to Study Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2019-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Corrections Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0772 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-04 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.