TN SB0770 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the number of signatures that a petition must bear for purposes of qualifying as a recognized minor party; revises the number of votes that a political party must receive for purposes of qualifying as a statewide political party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1 and Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, revises the number of signatures that a petition must bear for purposes of qualifying as a recognized minor party; revises the number of votes that a political party must receive for purposes of qualifying as a statewide political party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1 and Title 2, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0662 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee