TN HB0662 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises the number of signatures that a petition must bear for purposes of qualifying as a recognized minor party; revises the number of votes that a political party must receive for purposes of qualifying as a statewide political party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1 and Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, revises the number of signatures that a petition must bear for purposes of qualifying as a recognized minor party; revises the number of votes that a political party must receive for purposes of qualifying as a statewide political party. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1 and Title 2, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0770 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Deferred to Summer Study