TN SB0769 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission, state board of education, and public schools of this state from recommending, approving, or using textbooks and instructional materials and supplemental instructional materials created to align with the common core state standards. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22, relative to common core state standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-08SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-08SenateConcurred, Ayes 22, Nays 6 (Amendment 1 - HA0028)
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/8/2021
2021-04-01SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/8/2021
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/1/2021
2021-03-25SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/1/2021
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 3/25/2021
2021-03-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 64, Nays 19, PNV 2
2021-03-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0028)
2021-03-15HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-11SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 3
2021-03-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0030)
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2021
2021-03-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0782 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-15 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback