TN HB0782 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission, state board of education, and public schools from recommending, approving, or using textbooks and instructional materials and supplemental instructional materials created to align exclusively with the common core state standards or that are marketed or otherwise identified as common core textbooks or materials; provides for withholding of funds if teacher or principal intentionally violates prohibition on such textbooks and materials. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22, relative to common core state standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 205
2021-03-15HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-03-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021
2021-03-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction for 3/10/2021
2021-03-02HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education Instruction
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0769 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 205

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback