TN SB0765 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Pub. Ch. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates an exception to the offense of unlawful carrying of a firearm, if a person meets age requirements, lawfully possesses the handgun, and is in a place that the person is lawfully present; revises other firearm statutes. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 12 BY TODD PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 8 BY WARNER PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 15 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY MILLER PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Table Amend# 2 by Yarbro (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12 Pub. Ch. 108
2021-04-12 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-04-08SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-31SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-03-29HousePassed H., Ayes 64, Nays 29, PNV 0
2021-03-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0042)
2021-03-29HouseAm. failed to consider Ayes 23, No 69, PNV 1 (Amendment 12 - HA0143)
2021-03-29HouseAm. out of order (Amendment 11 - HA0142)
2021-03-29HouseAm. out of order (Amendment 10 - HA0141)
2021-03-29HouseAm. out of order (Amendment 9 - HA0140)
2021-03-29HouseFailed to adopt, Ayes 15, Nays 78, PNV 0 (Amendment 8 - HA0139)
2021-03-29HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 7 - HA0137)
2021-03-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - HA0131)
2021-03-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA0130)
2021-03-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0129)
2021-03-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0128)
2021-03-29HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0127)
2021-03-29HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-22HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-18SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 9
2021-03-18SenateAmendment tabled (Amendment 2 - SA0068)
2021-03-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0029)
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021
2021-03-16SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/16/2021
2021-03-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/2/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0786 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback