TN HB0786 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates an exception to the offense of unlawful carrying of a firearm, if a person meets age requirements, lawfully possesses the handgun, and is in a place that the person is lawfully present; revises other firearm statutes. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to firearms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 108
2021-03-29HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-03-25HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021
2021-03-23HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-11HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0765 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Pub. Ch. 108

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0786&ga=112
Texthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/HB0786.pdf
Texthttps://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/112/pub/pc0108.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0042.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0127.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0128.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0129.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0130.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0131.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0137.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0139.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0140.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0141.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0142.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Amend/HA0143.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/HB0786.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0088.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0793.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Fiscal/FM0848.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback